THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 9:05:46 AM
Gilani, Ammar Anwar
CPSO#:
78591
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
07 Jul 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of the Punjab, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
668 Concession Street
Hamilton ON L8V 4T9
Phone: (905) 538-4146
Fax: (905) 538-4147
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:07 Jul 2004 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jan 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 30 Jan 2014 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jan 2014 |
|
Active |