THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 21:28:13 PM
Melton, Ellen
CPSO#:
78583
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Jan 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Jan 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian
Education: Novosibirsk Medical Institute, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Curans Heart Centre
1165 Barton Street
Thunder Bay ON P7B 5N3
Phone: (807) 345-3355
Fax: (807) 345-0099
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Atikokan General Hospital |
Atikokan |
Dryden Regional Health Centre |
Dryden |
Geraldton District Hospital |
Geraldton |
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital |
Red Lake |
Sante Manitouwadge Health |
Manitouwadge |
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre |
Sioux Lookout |
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Apr 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ELLEN MELTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MELTON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2002 to 01 Apr 2003
International Specialist Physician - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Apr 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 May 2003 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Aug 2006 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 31 Aug 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Jan 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jan 2010 |