THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 0:30:52 AM
Mele, Tina Stefania
CPSO#:
78569
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Jul 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
University Hospital
Rm C8 - 004
339 Windmere Rd
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3531
Fax: 519-663-8813
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:13 Sep 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TINA STEFANIA MELE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MELE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Nov 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 2004 |