THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 19:13:40 PM
Ferguson, Sarah Helen
CPSO#:
78568
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Nov 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Nov 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Liverpool School of Medici, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Georgetown Medical Associates
199 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON L7G 0E3
Phone: (905) 873-3000
Fax: (905) 873-0800
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital |
Milton |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital |
Georgetown |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Jun 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SARAH HELEN FERGUSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERGUSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2002 to 31 Mar 2003
International Specialist Physician - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Jul 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Nov 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Nov 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Nov 2009 |