THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 20:02:36 PM
Nechala, Patrik
CPSO#:
78567
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jun 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jun 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 7105
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 371-8311
Fax: (519) 371-8365
Electoral District: 03
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Meaford Site |
Meaford |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound |
Owen Sound |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:26 Sep 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PATRIK NECHALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NECHALA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Oct 2002 to 28 Oct 2002
EL - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Oct 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Oct 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2006 |