THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 12:21:23 PM
Nicholson, Jennifer Margaret
CPSO#:
78556
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Oct 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Oct 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1800 8th St E
Owen Sound ON N4K 6M9
Phone: 5193712651
Fax: 5193716178
Electoral District: 03
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Jennifer Nicholson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 18 2009
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nova Scotia
Prince Edward Island
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound |
Owen Sound |
North Bay Regional Health Centre |
North Bay |
Pembroke Regional Hospital |
Pembroke |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:23 Sep 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JENNIFER MARGARET NICHOLSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NICHOLSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2002 to 22 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2003 to 22 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2004 to 22 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2005 to 22 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2002 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Aug 2006 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Jan 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 2017 |