THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 3:46:59 AM
Steyn, Jacobus Johannes
CPSO#:
78540
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Oct 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Oct 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Afrikaans, English
Education: University of Pretoria School of Medicin, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
75 Charles St
Brockville ON K6V 1S8
Phone: 1-613-345-5649 Ext. 51300
Fax: 1-613-345-8308
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brockville General Hospital |
Brockville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:26 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JACOBUS JOHANNES STEYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEYN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Oct 2002 to 30 Jan 2003
International Specialist Physician - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jan 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Feb 2003 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Jun 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Oct 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Oct 2005 |