THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 7:54:04 AM
Jacka, Robert Michael
CPSO#:
78533
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Feb 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Apr 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
304 Bellevue St
Peterborough ON K9H 5G1
Phone: 705 743-7100
Electoral District: 06
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: R. M. Jacka Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:03 Dec 2003 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT MICHAEL JACKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACKA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Sep 2002 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Sep 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Nov 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Feb 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Apr 2004 |