THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 20:11:06 PM
Moore, Julie Bennett
CPSO#:
78525
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jun 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Indiana University, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Alexandra Marine & General Hospital
Dept of Obstetrics and Gynaecology
120 Napier Street
Goderich ON N7A 1W5
Phone: (519) 524-8323
Fax: (519) 524-8527
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: J. Moore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 17 2018
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Clinton Public Hospital |
Clinton |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre |
Kincardine |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:01 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JULIE BENNETT MOORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOORE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Sep 2002 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Sep 2002 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 22 Jul 2003 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2007 |