THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 23:41:46 PM
Swadi, Omar
CPSO#:
78518
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Sep 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Sep 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Baghdad College of Medicin, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
123 Edward St
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
Toronto ON M5G 1E2
Phone: 416-963-9640
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:04 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. OMAR SWADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWADI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 09 Sep 2002 to 08 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Sep 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Sep 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Nov 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Sep 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Sep 2006 |