THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 17:58:56 PM
grewal, ruby
CPSO#:
78511
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jul 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
Roth|McFarlane
Hand and Upper Limb Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON N6A 4L6
Phone: (519) 646-6286
Fax: (519) 646-6049
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RUBY GREWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREWAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2002 to 30 Sep 2002
EL - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Sep 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 2004 |