THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 17:15:34 PM
Minnis, Shantel Monique
CPSO#:
78510
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Dec 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Dec 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the West Indies, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
7111 Syntex Dr
3rd Floor
Mississauga ON L5N 8C3
Phone: 18885907662
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Bahamas
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brockville General Hospital |
Brockville |
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital |
Collingwood |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound |
Owen Sound |
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital |
Dunnville |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Kemptville District Hospital |
Kemptville |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
West Haldimand,General Hospital |
Hagersville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHANTEL MONIQUE MINNIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MINNIS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 02 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 03 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Sep 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Mar 2010 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 2020 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 2020 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Dec 2020 |