THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 11:00:39 AM
Rooney, Rachel Ann Dorothea
CPSO#:
78503
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Dec 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Dec 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Katocs, Rachel Ann Dorothea (used until: 05 Sep 2002 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesiology
Victory 2
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 7827
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Nov 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RACHEL ANN DOROTHEA ROONEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROONEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Sep 2002 to 31 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Nov 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Dec 2004 to 30 Nov 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Dec 2005 |