THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 7:32:05 AM
Davey, Cecile Delaine
CPSO#:
78502
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 May 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 May 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Jamaican Creole
Education: University of the West Indies, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Electoral District: 03
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Jamaica
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:01 Sep 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CECILE DELAINE DAVEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2005 to 31 Jan 2006
International Specialist Physician - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jan 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Aug 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Aug 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 May 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 May 2011 |