THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 1:50:11 AM
Fayez, Ibrahim Halim Ibrahim
CPSO#:
78492
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Sep 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Sep 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
MCI
5230 Dundas Street West
Etobicoke
Toronto ON M9B 1A8
Phone: 416 234 8668
Fax: 416 234 8720
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. I. Fayez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 14 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Jul 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Dermatology |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. IBRAHIM HALIM IBRAHIM FAYEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAYEZ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Aug 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 2006 |