THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 15:45:32 PM
Kolbe, George Augustus
CPSO#:
78488
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Aug 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Afrikaans, English
Education: University of Pretoria School of Medicin, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 1561 Stn Main
Brockville ON K6V 6E6
Phone: 16132130864
Fax: 16133420505
Electoral District: 06
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: George Augustus Kolbe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 6 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
South Africa
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:27 Nov 2001 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Aug 2002 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2021 |