THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 10:07:31 AM
Jefremova, Ljudmilla
CPSO#:
78482
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Dec 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Dec 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish, Russian, Ukrainian
Education: University of Tartu, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
145 Government Rd E
Blanche River Health
Kirkland lake side
Kirkland Lake ON P2N 3P4
Phone: (705) 568-2155
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Englehart and District Hospital |
Englehart |
Kirkland and District Hospital |
Kirkland Lake |
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority |
Moose Factory |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:29 Nov 2005 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LJUDMILLA JEFREMOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEFREMOVA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 03 Sep 2002 to 27 Sep 2002
EL - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Ottawa, 07 Oct 2002 to 29 Nov 2002
EL - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Sep 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Sep 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Oct 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Nov 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Dec 2005 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: November 15, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.
Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Note: Effective August 8, 2018, Dr. Jefremova has completed all components of her SCERP.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: November 15, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.
Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Note: As of May 17, 2018, Dr. Jefremova completed the requirements of her SCERP.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)