THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 21:10:50 PM
Murdoch, John Alexander Campbell
CPSO#:
78475
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
05 May 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Aug 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
5-May-2020
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: John Murdoch Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 24 2020
Corporation Name: Parlow Saha Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 2 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:29 May 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 2002 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Aug 2002 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 22 Aug 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Jun 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Jun 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Aug 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Aug 2008 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 05 May 2020 |