THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 13:18:43 PM
Benjamin, Matthew Stephen
CPSO#:
78474
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Apr 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Apr 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Boston University, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Massachusetts
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site |
Ajax |
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare |
Bracebridge |
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital |
Huntsville |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MATTHEW STEPHEN BENJAMIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENJAMIN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 2002 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Aug 2002 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 15 Aug 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Apr 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Apr 2004 |