THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 9:13:11 AM
El-Sadi, Salman Abdel Khader Salman
CPSO#:
78473
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Aug 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Aug 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Jordan, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: 5196858500
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Alexandra Hospital |
Ingersoll |
Campbellford Memorial Hospital |
Campbellford |
Listowel Memorial Hospital |
Listowel |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre |
Kincardine |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Jun 2001 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:11 Dec 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SALMAN ABDEL KHADER SALMAN EL-SADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-SADI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 2002 |