THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 17:16:31 PM
Hendy, Ayman Mahmoud Mohamed Ibrahiem
CPSO#:
78461
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Mar 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Mar 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Queen Elizabeth II Health Services
Halifax Infirmary Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
1796 Summer Street
Halifax NS B3H 3A7
Phone: (902) 473-2700
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: A. Hendy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 9 2015
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nova Scotia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 Jan 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AYMAN MAHMOUD MOHAMED IBRAHIEM HENDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENDY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2002 to 28 Feb 2003
International Specialist Physician - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Mar 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Sep 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Feb 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |