THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 5:16:18 AM
Aziz, Abdul
CPSO#:
78460
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jul 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Pashto, Urdu
Education: University of Peshawar, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kennedy Medical Clinic
Unit 9
7990 Kennedy Road South
Brampton ON L6W 0B3
Phone: (905) 455-5445
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:01 Jul 2005 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Jun 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Oct 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Dec 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Jun 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Apr 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Apr 2010 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 08 Apr 2010 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Apr 2010 |
|
Active |