THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 17:24:38 PM
Adam, David Neal
CPSO#:
78455
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Sep 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Sep 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite G-02
95 Bayly St. West
Ajax ON L1S 7K8
Phone: (905) 427-3996
Fax: (905) 619-0438
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID NEAL ADAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 26 Aug 2002 to 22 Sep 2002
EL - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 16 Dec 2002 to 12 Jan 2003
EL - Rheumatology
University of Toronto, 02 Jun 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
EL - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Sep 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Dec 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Jan 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 May 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Sep 2007 |