THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 14:59:12 PM
Barankin, Benjamin
CPSO#:
78418
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Dermatology Centre
Suite 400
4256 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M3H 5Y8
Phone: (416) 633-0001
Fax: (416) 633-0002
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:30 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BENJAMIN BARANKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARANKIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2002 to 25 Aug 2002
EL - Dermatology
University of Ottawa, 07 Nov 2004 to 19 Nov 2004
EL - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2005 to 18 Sep 2005
EL - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Aug 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Aug 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Nov 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Nov 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Sep 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2006 |