THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 0:48:21 AM
Ghani, Ikram
CPSO#:
78399
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jun 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jun 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200
Fax: (905) 813-4036
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Jun 2009 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Oct 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Mar 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Mar 2011 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Mar 2011 |
|
Active |