THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 1:25:54 AM
Juneja, Romi
CPSO#:
78398
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jun 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
390 Queens Quay West
P.O. Box 40086
Toronto ON M5V 0A4
Phone: (416) 862-9824
Fax: (416) 862-9824
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Romi Juneja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 24 2023
Corporation Name: R. Juneja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 12 2011
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 May 2005 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROMI JUNEJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JUNEJA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2002 to 31 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2004 to 12 Apr 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Oct 2006
CF - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Apr 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2005 |