THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 19:16:09 PM
Gunnarsson, Thorsteinn
CPSO#:
78285
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Aug 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Icelandic, Swedish
Education: University of Iceland, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Thorsteinn Gunnarsson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 10 2017
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Iceland
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Jul 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Aug 2012 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 30 Jun 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 28 Feb 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2018 |