THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 9:05:23 AM
Bowry, Richard
CPSO#:
78264
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Aug 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Aug 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
4001 Leslie St
North York General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
Room 1E-174
North York ON M2K 1E1
Phone: 416 756 6502
Fax: 855 756 3454
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:17 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RICHARD BOWRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOWRY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Aug 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Aug 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 2011 |