THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 13:36:07 PM
Rana, Abdul Qayyum
CPSO#:
78259
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jul 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Persian, Urdu
Education: University of the Punjab, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
111-2680 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough Health Centre
Scarborough ON M1P 4Y4
Phone: 416 755 2242
Fax: 833 563 2242
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:28 May 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ABDUL QAYYUM RANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 May 2002 to 01 Sep 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 02 Sep 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Neurology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 13 Aug 2004
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 2004 |