THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 6:31:21 AM
Campisi, Paolo
CPSO#:
78214
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Italian
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Otolaryngology
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-2192
Fax: (416) 813-5036
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAOLO CAMPISI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPISI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
Research Fellows - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2002 |