THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 15:07:18 PM
Ramphal, Raveena
CPSO#:
78210
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 May 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 May 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Natal, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
C H E O
Suite 2639
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2370
Fax: (613) 738-4828
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:01 May 2004 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Paediatric Haematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Apr 2004
CF - Paediatric Haematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Apr 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Mar 2011 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 23 Mar 2011 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Mar 2011 |
|
Active |