THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 19:46:43 PM
Alrajhi, Abdulaziz A M
CPSO#:
78161
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Jan 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Jan 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 3354
Dept of Emergency Medicine MBC#84
King Faisal Specialist Hospital
and Research Center
Riyadh 11211
Saudi Arabia
Phone: +966114647272 Ext. 31470
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Alrajhi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 3 2013
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saudi Arabia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ABDULAZIZ A M ALRAJHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALRAJHI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
CF - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jan 2009 |