THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 6:54:54 AM
Nair, Girish Madhavan
CPSO#:
78128
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
17 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Malayalam, Tamil, Urdu
Education: Jawaharlal Inst Postgraduate Med Educ, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa Heart
Institute
Room H 1285 B
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7272
Fax: (613) 696-7123
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nunavut
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiology |
Effective:16 Jun 2016 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:25 Oct 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:25 Oct 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Aug 2004
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Jun 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Jun 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Aug 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Sep 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 2016 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Jun 2016 |
|
Active |