THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 0:38:13 AM
Sell Marucco, Erick Fernando
CPSO#:
78114
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Feb 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
22 Feb 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad Autonoma de Centro America, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3467
Fax: (613) 738-4879
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:22 Feb 2008 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Paediatric Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2004 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Feb 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Dec 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jul 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Sep 2015 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 02 Sep 2015 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Sep 2015 |
|
Active |