THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 18:45:44 PM
Boyden, Sheri Nadine
CPSO#:
78086
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Dec 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Dec 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Rideau Valley Health Centre
1221 Greenbank Road
Ottawa ON K2J 5V7
Phone: (613) 258-8710
Fax: (613) 440-3238
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Dec 2003 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHERI NADINE BOYDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYDEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Nov 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2002 to 30 Nov 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 2003 |