THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 11:26:46 AM
Henis, Mohsen Shenouda Hanna
CPSO#:
78052
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Dec 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Dec 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Asyut University, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Bonis-Birchmount Medical Clinic
5 Bonis Avenue
Scarborough ON M1T 2T9
Phone: (416) 335-0077
Fax: (416) 335-9277
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Dec 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHSEN SHENOUDA HANNA HENIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENIS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Nov 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Dec 2004 |