THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 1:54:06 AM
Barkman, Carla Nicole
CPSO#:
78045
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
04 Jun 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Dec 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Milo, Carla Nicole (used until: 27 Nov 2012 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Carla Barkman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 16 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:123 Marks St
St Atikokan, ON P0T 1C0
Date Received: 25 May 2017
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saskatchewan
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:12 Jun 2002 |
CFPC Specialist |
FCFP - Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Nov 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 2002 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Dec 2018 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 04 Jun 2021 |