THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 14:35:57 PM
Duggal, Anil
CPSO#:
78042
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Oct 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Oct 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McMaster University, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records Management LTd- Health Information Services
13-1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Tel: 1-800-775-0093
Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 28 Jul 2017
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Kentucky
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bluewater Health |
Sarnia |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:19 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANIL DUGGAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUGGAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Dec 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Feb 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Sep 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Aug 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Aug 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Nov 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Oct 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Oct 2015 |