THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 1:22:42 AM
Patlas, Michael
CPSO#:
78034
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Feb 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
14 Feb 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: The Hebrew University-Hadassah Medical S, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
585 University Ave
Joint Department of Medical Imaging
Toronto General Hospital
Peter Munk Building, 1PMB 283
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Michael Patlas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 14 2018
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:23 Oct 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 15 Feb 2004
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Feb 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Feb 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Nov 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Dec 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Dec 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Feb 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Feb 2011 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Feb 2011 |
|
Active |