THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 10:58:58 AM
Sood, Manish Micheal
CPSO#:
78018
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Dec 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Dec 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: University of Toronto, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 82526
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:19 Sep 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MANISH MICHEAL SOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOOD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2006 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Aug 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Dec 2013 |