THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 22:35:20 PM
Vesprini, Daniel John
CPSO#:
78003
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
Room T2 11
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4806
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Radiation Oncology |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DANIEL JOHN VESPRINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VESPRINI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Radiation Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 2008 |