THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 3:33:00 AM
Van Spall, Harriette Gillian Christine
CPSO#:
78001
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jul 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jul 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre
Division of Cardiology
D B R B Suite C3 117
237 Barton Street
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: 9055212100 Ext. 40601
Fax: 9052973785
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: H. Van Spall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 5 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:01 Jan 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HARRIETTE GILLIAN CHRISTINE VAN SPALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN SPALL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 01 Jan 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Sep 2010
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2006 |