THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 15:54:58 PM
Trigazis, Leonidas
CPSO#:
77997
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Jan 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Jan 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Greek
Education: University of Toronto, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
170 Lakeview Crt
Orangeville ON L9W 5J7
Phone: 519-307-1201
Fax: 519-307-1304
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2005 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LEONIDAS TRIGAZIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRIGAZIS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jan 2006 |