THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 18:15:17 PM
Rizvi, Shahbano Hussain
CPSO#:
77995
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Mar 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Mar 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: Aga Khan University, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
243 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON K8N 1E2
Phone: (613) 968-9934
Fax: (613) 968-9935
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial |
Trenton |
Quinte Healthcare Corporation |
Belleville |
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site |
Picton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:01 Jan 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHAHBANO HUSSAIN RIZVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIZVI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Trauma General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
International Specialist Physician - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2004 to 31 Mar 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Feb 2007 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 27 Feb 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |