THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 16:40:55 PM
Tan, Lana Suanne
CPSO#:
77989
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Apr 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
100 Solstice Way
Waterloo ON N2K 0G3
Phone: 519-578-9757 Ext. 2
Fax: 519-578-9750
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site |
Kitchener |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:21 Jun 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LANA SUANNE TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Apr 2005 |