THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 11:47:49 AM
Stotland, Peter Kenneth
CPSO#:
77983
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
4001 Leslie Street
North York General Hospital
Department of Surgery
Suite 3SE-115
Toronto ON M2K 1E1
Phone: (416)756 6618
Fax: (416)572 7152
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PETER KENNETH STOTLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STOTLAND is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Surgical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Surgical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2007 |