THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 1:18:51 AM
Salyani, Mohamed Asif
CPSO#:
77980
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 May 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 May 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
16945 Leslie Street
Unit 44
Newmarket ON L3Y 9A2
Phone: (905) 235-8055
Fax: (855) 203-1060
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOHAMED ASIF SALYANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALYANI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 May 2009 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Nov 2022 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 22 Nov 2022 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 May 2023 |