THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 19:47:46 PM
Rocca, Antonio Stevereves
CPSO#:
77977
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Aug 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: University of Toronto, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Polyclinic Specialty Medicine
Cardiology
Unit B10
2 Champagne Drive
Toronto ON M3H 5S4
Phone: (416) 222-6160 Ext. 243
Fax: (416) 645-1979
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:19 Sep 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANTONIO STEVEREVES ROCCA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROCCA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Sep 2010
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 13 Dec 2010 to 31 Aug 2011
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 2006 |