THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 8:45:36 AM
Kreichman, Daniel
CPSO#:
77946
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew, Russian
Education: University of Toronto, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
701 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON M2K 2Z3
Phone: 4166441404
Fax: 4166441406
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DANIEL KREICHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KREICHMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 16 Sep 2009
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2007 |