THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 13:36:26 PM
Hamrahi, Hormoz
CPSO#:
77932
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jun 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Persian
Education: University of Toronto, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
220 Sherway Dr
Etobicoke ON M9C 0A7
Phone: (416) 626-2138
Fax: 6476892193
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Jun 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HORMOZ HAMRAHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMRAHI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2002 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 2004 |